Bennett, Matthew Trevor (CPSO#: 88321)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2010