Bennett, Susan (CPSO#: 54677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Director Social Pediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 738-3626
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bennett ( CPSO# 54677 )

Business Address:
The Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Child and Youth Protection Program
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 738-3626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 1988 to 15 Feb 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2008