Bennett, William Russell Murray (CPSO#: 65497)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1999