Benoit, Brien Georges (CPSO#: 18752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1963

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1963

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
129 Helena Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 3N3
Phone: (613) 729-6587
Fax: (613) 729-6587
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

129 Helena St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 3N3
Canada
Phone: (613) 729-6587
Fax: (613) 729-6587
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

875 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Canada
Phone: (613) 725-2000 Ext. 692
Fax: 613-725-1300
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brien Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIEN GEORGES BENOIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENOIT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1965