Benoit, Jean-Marc (CPSO#: 83720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5507
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Marc Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Benoit ( CPSO# 83720 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 24 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-MARC BENOIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENOIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2005