Benoit, Joseph Jean Samuel Guy (CPSO#: 41031)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1989