Benseler, Susanne Liselotte Maria (CPSO#: 76346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric
Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 308925
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2005 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 01 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Susanne Liselotte Maria Benseler may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University of Toronto, in which Dr. Benseler holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required  by the teaching or research requirements of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically  expire  when  Dr.  Benseler no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.