Bensimon, Eric (CPSO#: 74114)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French

Education:Laval University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2001