Benson, Richard James (CPSO#: 72972)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1999