Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bentley-Taylor, Michael Martin (CPSO#: 23790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 Mohawk Avenue
Waterloo ON  N2L 2T3
Phone: (226) 989-6771
Fax: 5192087449
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Sunnyside Drive
St George
St George Brant ON  N0E 1N0
Canada
Phone: (519) 448-3331
Fax: (519) 448-3334
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bentley-Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bentley-Taylor ( CPSO# 23790 )

Business Address:
206 Mohawk Avenue
Waterloo ON  N2L 2T3
Phone Number: (519) 989-6771

Business Address:
St George Medical Center
2 Sunnyside Drive
St George ON  N0E 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 448-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MARTIN BENTLEY-TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENTLEY-TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1971