Benzaquen, Susan (CPSO#: 56902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 215
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 764-5040
Fax: (905) 764-2977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Benzaquen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Benzaquen ( CPSO# 56902 )

Business Address:
215 - 7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 764-5040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN BENZAQUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENZAQUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1989