Berall, Glenn Brian (CPSO#: 54698)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 31 Jul 1984
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016