Berard, Roberta Audrey (CPSO#: 79511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Western On
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8379
Fax: (519) 685-8156
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Berard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Berard ( CPSO# 79511 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8138

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTA AUDREY BERARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2008 to 18 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008