Berardinucci, Don Louis (CPSO#: 63746)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 08 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 2011