Berbece, Adriana Niculina (CPSO#: 74829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Suite 339 Sunnyside W Building
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6239
Fax: (416) 530-6722
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. N. Berbece Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berbece ( CPSO# 74829 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
339 - 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6239

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA NICULINA BERBECE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERBECE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004