Berber, Mark Joseph (CPSO#: 56573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
377 Church Street
Suite 408
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-5733
Fax: (905) 472-5215
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOSEPH BERBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1987