Berbrayer, David (CPSO#: 32418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4069
Fax: (416) 480-6885
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bloorview Kids Rehab
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bloorview Kids Rehab
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Berbrayer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Berbrayer ( CPSO# 32418 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4069

Business Address:
Bloorview Kids Rehab
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BERBRAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERBRAYER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1981