Bercovici, Mark Charles (CPSO#: 50138)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bercovici Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017