Beresford, John Spencer (CPSO#: 28622)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1994

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Apr 1994
Summary:

 In September 1993, Dr. Beresford pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice 
 of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, 
 contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  The Discipline Committee 
 accepted this plea, and found Dr. Beresford guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, in 
 April 1994 the Committee ordered that Dr. Beresford be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
 to be recorded on the Register.  In addition, the Committee ruled that the Doctor's practice be 
 restricted to male patients; that he be required to attend sessions with a psychiatrist at least 
 every three weeks for at least three months and thereafter no less frequently than every four 
 weeks; that the psychiatrist must be acceptable to the Registrar; that the psychiatrist must 
 submit quarterly reports to the Registrar stating that Dr. Beresford was compliant and stable; and 
 that the psychiatrist must report immediately any deviation that might jeopardize the public.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 07, 1993