Beresford, Meaghen Joanne (CPSO#: 76273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: Hyland, Meaghen Joanne (used until: 06 Nov 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mt Sinai Hosp., 600 University Ave
rm 1276, 12th Floor
Marvelle Koffler Breast Cen, TO, ON
M5G1XS
Toronto ON  M5S 1B5
Phone: 647-524-0514
Fax: 416-946-6564
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (647) 524-0514
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

610 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G2M9
Canada
Phone: 647-524-0514
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Beresford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Beresford ( CPSO# 76273 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (647) 524-0514

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Room 3-962
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (647) 524-0514

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (647) 524-0514

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (647) 524-0514

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEAGHEN JOANNE BERESFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERESFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 01 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2006