Berezny, Garry Michael (CPSO#: 32273)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Berezny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 338 County Rd 3 Belleville ON K8N 4Z1
Date Received: 01 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017