Berezowsky, Joan Coralie (CPSO#: 61174)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012