Berg, Gary Richard (CPSO#: 65343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
380 Burnham Street
Suite 104
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone: (705) 741-3055
Fax: (705) 741-5075
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Riverview Manor
1155 Water Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 3P8
Canada
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Berg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Berg ( CPSO# 65343 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 1T6
Phone Number: (705) 741-3055

Business Address:
Riverview Manor
1155 Water Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 3P8
Phone Number: (705) 748-6706

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY RICHARD BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993