Bergen, Dorothea (CPSO#: 59137)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Dec 1989