Berger, Alan Richard (CPSO#: 52456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital Health Centre
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3663
Fax: (416) 867-3672
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Toronto Retina Institute
In The Shops at Don Mills
Suite 208
6 Maggin Mews
North York ON  M3C 0G9
Canada
Phone: (416) 449-3937
Fax: (416) 449-0874
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berger ( CPSO# 52456 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital Health Centre
801 - 61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3704


Corporation Name: Dr. David Chow and Dr. Alan Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berger ( CPSO# 52456 )
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 62433 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9

Business Address:
Suite 801
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN RICHARD BERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1986