Berger, Christopher William (CPSO#: 59078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Anaesthesia
10 W Victoria VG Site
1276 South Park St
Halifax NS  B3J 2K8
Phone: (902) 473-2331

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM BERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1987