Berger, Yoav Yaakov (CPSO#: 83610)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 23 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006