Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bergeron, Richard (CPSO#: 60018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
4 Beechwood Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1M 1M2
Phone: (613) 729-0722
Fax: (613) 729-1266
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1991