Bergin, Margaret Lynn (CPSO#: 53970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3486
Fax: (519) 663-3487
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bergin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bergin ( CPSO# 53970 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3486

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET LYNN BERGIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988