Bergman, Jacobus Johannes Gerardus Hendrikus Maria (CPSO#: 89970)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:State University of Utrecht, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2014