Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bergstrome, Brant Eric (CPSO#: 64412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1995

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Hamburg University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Ext. 2043
Fax: (705) 549-3652
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brant E. Bergstrome Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015


Corporation Name: Brant E. Bergstrome Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bergstrome ( CPSO# 64412 )

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANT ERIC BERGSTROME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGSTROME is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1995
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 02 Oct 2000

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2000
Summary:

 On March 8, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Bergstrome(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee subsequently ordered the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Bergstrome be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the 
 Register;
2.	Dr. Bergstrome(s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 12 months, 
 to commence on April 1, 2000, six months of which will be suspended if Dr. Bergstrome fulfills the 
 following conditions:

(a)	that he attend at his own cost, a program satisfactory to the Registrar 
 on boundary violations and provide proof to the Registrar of having attended and competed such a 
 program; and

(b)	that upon his return to practise and for a period of six months thereafter, he 
 shall maintain, at his own expense, a peer relationship with a senior psychiatrist acceptable to 
 the Registrar which shall involve monthly discussions of boundaries and other clinical issues.  
 Such senior psychiatrist shall provide a report to the Registrar at the end of each three month 
 period that Dr. Bergstrome has attended upon him or her and participated in such 
 discussions.

3.	In the event that the Registrar is notified of a breach of any of the above 
 conditions, the certificate of registration shall be suspended for the balance of the twelve month 
 term, i.e., a further six months.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 08, 2000