Berih, Abdullahi Alisheikh (CPSO#: 64126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Eritrean

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UNIT 106
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2M4
Phone: (416) 247-8781
Fax: (416) 247-8670
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berih ( CPSO# 64126 )

Business Address:
106 - 245 Dixon Road
Toronto ON  M9P 2M4
Phone Number: (416) 247-8781

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULLAHI ALISHEIKH BERIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERIH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992