Berinstein, Neil Lorne (CPSO#: 50151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5248
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Berinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Berinstein ( CPSO# 50151 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 564-5848

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL LORNE BERINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988