Berkelhammer, Charles Haimie (CPSO#: 32840)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9921 Southwest Highway
Oak Lawn IL  60453
United States
Phone: (708) 499-5678
Fax: (708) 499-5685

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES HAIMIE BERKELHAMMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERKELHAMMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1986