Berlet, Gregory Charles (CPSO#: 66343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orthopedic Foot and Ankle Center
Suite 2000
300 Polaris Parkway
Westerville OH  43082
United States
Phone: (614) 895-8747
Fax: (614) 895-8810

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY CHARLES BERLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993