Berlie, Marie Carmen (CPSO#: 65007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waskaganish Clinic
Waskaganish QC  J0M 1R0
Phone: (819) 895-8833 Ext. 4016
Fax: (819) 895-8866
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

43 Northgate Street
Ottawa ON  K2G 6C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 407-3443
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berlie Khazzam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Khazzam ( CPSO# 57947 )
Dr. M. Berlie ( CPSO# 65007 )

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland Road
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Business Address:
43 Northgate Street
Ottawa ON  K2G 6C8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE CARMEN BERLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1996