Berlin Rosenblut, Alejandro Miguel (CPSO#: 99728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2015

Expiry Date:  22 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:Catholic University of Chile, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue, 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2126
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alejandro Berlin Rosenblut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chung ( CPSO# 76790 )
Dr. A. Berlin Rosenblut ( CPSO# 99728 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (647) 884-6147

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Chile

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 15 Feb 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Alejandro Miguel Berlin Rosenblut may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Radiation
                        Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Berlin Rosenblut
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Berlin Rosenblut no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Berlin
                        Rosenblut's clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Berlin Rosenblut's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 15, 2015, and currently has an
                  interim expiry date of August 22, 2018.  The expiry date of this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.