Berlin, Solomon (CPSO#: 18682)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Berlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene St North York, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Instructions: Patients may contact Docudavit Solutions Inc. as per above.
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018