Berlyne, Graham Samuel (CPSO#: 70873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building
Suite 310
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6158
Fax: (416) 532-4448
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM SAMUEL BERLYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERLYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Apr 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005