Berman, David Elliot (CPSO#: 59134)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 1990 to 31 May 1990
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Sep 1997