Berman, Graham (CPSO#: 23212)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Berman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 21 Jun 2017


Address: Medical record requests may be sent to the following address: Apartment 8A 1 Chedington Place Toronto, ON M4N 3R4
Date Received: 15 Nov 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 2012