Berman, Hal Kenneth (CPSO#: 87365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
11th Floor Eaton Wing, 11E230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4607
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Laboratory Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Nov 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Hal Kenneth Berman may practise medicine independently in anatomical
            pathology, only