Bernard, Carrie Deborah (CPSO#: 71574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1331
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Bernard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bernard ( CPSO# 71574 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-1331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARRIE DEBORAH BERNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999