Bernard, Dalia Antonio (CPSO#: 81677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haldimand Family Health Team
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1T1
Phone: (905) 774-7541
Fax: (905) 774-4310
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Bernard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bernard ( CPSO# 81677 )

Business Address:
Haldimand Family Health Team
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1T1
Phone Number: (905) 774-7541

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIA ANTONIO BERNARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006