Bernard, Philippe Andre (CPSO#: 33001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Russian

Education:Universite de Lyon I, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1981
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Dec 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2001