Berner, Mark Steven (CPSO#: 28491)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 May 2007