Berney, Richard Thomas (CPSO#: 28600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17A James Street North
Forest ON  N0N 1J0
Phone: (519) 786-6363
Fax: (519) 786-6669
Electoral District: 01

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD THOMAS BERNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1976

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: October 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Download Full Document (PDF)