Bernier, Elise (CPSO#: 56454)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993