Bernstein, Ira Paul (CPSO#: 62382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 306
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-7731
Fax: (416) 781-4515
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ira Bernstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bernstein ( CPSO# 62382 )

Business Address:
306 - 960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-7731

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRA PAUL BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991