Bernstein, Jonathan Maxwell (CPSO#: 58136)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2006